MA H791 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 39-5)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-13 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling
Pending: House Steering, Policy and Scheduling Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-13 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling
Pending: House Steering, Policy and Scheduling Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to pesticide products eligible for use on the outdoor grounds of schools, child care centers or school age child care programs. Environment, Natural Resources and Agriculture.
Title
Relative to improving pesticide protections for Massachusetts schoolchildren
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-13 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2019-10-31 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 11/12/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in B-1 |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2019-01-22 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Environment, Natural Resources and Agriculture |
Same As/Similar To
H852 (Similar To) 2020-10-29 - Accompanied a study order, see H5072
H3142 (Similar To) 2019-11-07 - Accompanied H2998
H2994 (Similar To) 2019-11-07 - Accompanied H2998
S2131 (Similar To) 2019-11-18 - Accompanied S2075
S297 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2538
H426 (Similar To) 2020-12-03 - Accompanied a study order, see H5159
H3142 (Similar To) 2019-11-07 - Accompanied H2998
H2994 (Similar To) 2019-11-07 - Accompanied H2998
S2131 (Similar To) 2019-11-18 - Accompanied S2075
S297 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2538
H426 (Similar To) 2020-12-03 - Accompanied a study order, see H5159
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H791 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H791.pdf |