MA H797 | 2013-2014 | 188th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4400
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-08-18 - Accompanied a study order, see H4400
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-08-18 - Accompanied a study order, see H4400
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to providing funding for the rebuilding and maintenance of the Ponkapoag Boardwalk in the towns of Canton and Randolph. Environment, Natural Resources and Agriculture.
Title
Making an appropriation for the fiscal year 2014 to provide for the funding of the Ponkapoag Boardwalk in the towns of Canton and Randolph
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-08-18 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H4400 |
2013-03-29 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 03/21/2013 from 02:30 PM-04:00 PM in B-1 |
2013-01-22 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2013-01-22 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Environment, Natural Resources and Agriculture |
Same As/Similar To
H4400 (Replaced by) 2014-08-18 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/188/House/H797 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Document/Bill/188/House/H797.pdf |