MA H821 | 2013-2014 | 188th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4468
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-09-18 - Accompanied a study order, see H4468
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-09-18 - Accompanied a study order, see H4468
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relativerelative to vegetation control and no-spray agreements with municipalities and water districts. Environment, Natural Resources and Agriculture.
Title
Relative to vegetation management
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-09-18 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H4468 |
2013-05-09 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 05/09/2013 from 10:00 AM-12:00 PM in A-1 |
2013-01-22 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2013-01-22 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Environment, Natural Resources and Agriculture |
Same As/Similar To
H4468 (Replaced by) 2014-09-18 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/188/House/H821 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Document/Bill/188/House/H821.pdf |