MA H827 | 2011-2012 | 187th General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 19 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-06-03 - Hearing scheduled for 06/07/2011 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in 222
Pending: Joint State Administration and Regulatory Oversight Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 19 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-06-03 - Hearing scheduled for 06/07/2011 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in 222
Pending: Joint State Administration and Regulatory Oversight Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to accessible electronic information technology for persons with disabilities. State Administration and Regulatory Oversight.
Title
Relative to accessible electronic information technology for persons with disabilities
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-03 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 06/07/2011 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in 222 |
2011-01-24 | Senate | Senate concurred. |
2011-01-24 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on State Administration and Regulatory Oversight. |
2011-01-19 | House | Bill Filed. |
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/187/House/H827 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/PDF?billId=11269&generalCourtId=1 |