MA H828 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4111
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-28 - Accompanied a study order, see H4111
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-28 - Accompanied a study order, see H4111
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to regulating separate out-of-pocket insurance limits for prescription drugs, including specialty drugs. Financial Services.
Title
Relative to patient financial protection
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-28 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H4111 |
2015-07-16 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 07/21/2015 from 10:30 AM-01:00 PM in A-2 |
2015-01-20 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2015-01-20 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Financial Services |
Same As/Similar To
H4111 (Replaced by) 2016-04-04 - Reported, in part, by H948
S477 (Similar To) 2016-03-24 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S2293 (Similar To) 2016-05-19 - Reprinted as amended, see S2302
S1361 (Similar To) 2016-06-06 - Accompanied a study order, see S2314
S584 (Similar To) 2016-06-23 - Accompanied a study order, see S2356
S745 (Similar To) 2016-04-04 - Accompanied a study order, see S2204
S820 (Similar To) 2016-04-04 - Accompanied a study order, see S2204
S1795 (Similar To) 2016-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see S2388
S657 (Similar To) 2016-03-24 - New draft substituted, as amended, see S2183
S477 (Similar To) 2016-03-24 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S2293 (Similar To) 2016-05-19 - Reprinted as amended, see S2302
S1361 (Similar To) 2016-06-06 - Accompanied a study order, see S2314
S584 (Similar To) 2016-06-23 - Accompanied a study order, see S2356
S745 (Similar To) 2016-04-04 - Accompanied a study order, see S2204
S820 (Similar To) 2016-04-04 - Accompanied a study order, see S2204
S1795 (Similar To) 2016-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see S2388
S657 (Similar To) 2016-03-24 - New draft substituted, as amended, see S2183
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H828 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H828.pdf |