MA S1361 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2314
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on April 15 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-06-06 - Accompanied a study order, see S2314
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 15 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-06-06 - Accompanied a study order, see S2314
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation relative to protecting innocent beneficiaries. Public Service.
Title
Relative to protecting innocent beneficiaries
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-06 | Senate | Accompanied a study order, see S2314 |
2015-11-03 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 11/10/2015 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in A-1 |
2015-04-15 | House | House concurred |
2015-04-15 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Public Service |
Same As/Similar To
S2314 (Replaced by) 2016-06-09 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
S584 (Similar To) 2016-06-23 - Accompanied a study order, see S2356
S518 (Similar To) 2016-06-06 - Accompanied a study order, see S2318
S1212 (Similar To) 2015-08-10 - Accompanied a new draft, see S1993
S1881 (Similar To) 2016-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see S2387
S1445 (Similar To) 2016-03-03 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1702 (Similar To) 2016-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see S2386
S128 (Similar To) 2016-06-23 - Accompanied a study order, see S2357
S1218 (Similar To) 2016-02-29 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2149
S1153 (Similar To) 2015-12-21 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3911
S146 (Similar To) 2016-04-21 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2230
S2168 (Similar To) 2016-12-27 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
S584 (Similar To) 2016-06-23 - Accompanied a study order, see S2356
S518 (Similar To) 2016-06-06 - Accompanied a study order, see S2318
S1212 (Similar To) 2015-08-10 - Accompanied a new draft, see S1993
S1881 (Similar To) 2016-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see S2387
S1445 (Similar To) 2016-03-03 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1702 (Similar To) 2016-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see S2386
S128 (Similar To) 2016-06-23 - Accompanied a study order, see S2357
S1218 (Similar To) 2016-02-29 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2149
S1153 (Similar To) 2015-12-21 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3911
S146 (Similar To) 2016-04-21 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2230
S2168 (Similar To) 2016-12-27 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/S1361 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/S1361.pdf |