MA S1445 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on April 15 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-03 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 15 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-03 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to protect the rights of custodial and other non-teaching employees of school districts. Public Service.
Title
Protecting the rights of custodial and other non-teaching employees of school districts
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-03 | Senate | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means |
2015-06-02 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 06/02/2015 from 11:00 AM-01:00 PM in B-2 |
2015-04-15 | House | House concurred |
2015-04-15 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Public Service |
Same As/Similar To
S108 (Similar To) 2016-09-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H4613
S1361 (Similar To) 2016-06-06 - Accompanied a study order, see S2314
S1285 (Similar To) 2016-03-14 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S584 (Similar To) 2016-06-23 - Accompanied a study order, see S2356
S1212 (Similar To) 2015-08-10 - Accompanied a new draft, see S1993
S1881 (Similar To) 2016-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see S2387
S128 (Similar To) 2016-06-23 - Accompanied a study order, see S2357
S1218 (Similar To) 2016-02-29 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2149
S1339 (Similar To) 2016-06-06 - Accompanied a study order, see S2314
S407 (Similar To) 2016-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see S2380
S1363 (Similar To) 2016-06-06 - Accompanied a study order, see S2314
S972 (Similar To) 2015-06-15 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1402 (Similar To) 2016-06-06 - Accompanied a study order, see S2314
S437 (Similar To) 2015-11-25 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1390 (Similar To) 2016-02-22 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S640 (Similar To) 2016-06-23 - Accompanied a study order, see S2356
S1361 (Similar To) 2016-06-06 - Accompanied a study order, see S2314
S1285 (Similar To) 2016-03-14 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S584 (Similar To) 2016-06-23 - Accompanied a study order, see S2356
S1212 (Similar To) 2015-08-10 - Accompanied a new draft, see S1993
S1881 (Similar To) 2016-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see S2387
S128 (Similar To) 2016-06-23 - Accompanied a study order, see S2357
S1218 (Similar To) 2016-02-29 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2149
S1339 (Similar To) 2016-06-06 - Accompanied a study order, see S2314
S407 (Similar To) 2016-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see S2380
S1363 (Similar To) 2016-06-06 - Accompanied a study order, see S2314
S972 (Similar To) 2015-06-15 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1402 (Similar To) 2016-06-06 - Accompanied a study order, see S2314
S437 (Similar To) 2015-11-25 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1390 (Similar To) 2016-02-22 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S640 (Similar To) 2016-06-23 - Accompanied a study order, see S2356
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/S1445 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/S1445.pdf |