MA H836 | 2011-2012 | 187th General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-01-01 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-01-01 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to protecting tropical forests by restricting state purchases of certain wood products. State Administration and Regulatory Oversight.
Title
To protect tropical forests by restricting state purchases of certain wood products
Sponsors
Rep. Byron Rushing [D] | Rep. Kay Khan [D] | Rep. Peter Kocot [D] | Rep. Tom Sannicandro [D] |
Rep. Gloria Fox [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-01-01 | House | No further action taken |
2011-11-23 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the House committee on Ways and Means |
2011-06-03 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 05/03/2011 from 11:00 AM-02:00 PM in 222 |
2011-01-24 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2011-01-24 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on State Administration and Regulatory Oversight |
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/187/House/H836 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/PDF?billId=7773&generalCourtId=1 |