MA H853 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H5041
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-08-29 - Accompanied a study order, see H5041
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-08-29 - Accompanied a study order, see H5041
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to abandoned vessels on certain state property. Environment, Natural Resources and Agriculture.
Title
Relative to abandoned vessels on DCR property
Sponsors
Rep. David Biele [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-08-29 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H5041 |
2021-10-20 | Joint | Location Changed - Hearing scheduled for 10/27/2021 from 02:00 PM-05:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-10-20 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 10/27/2021 from 02:00 PM-05:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2021-03-29 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Environment, Natural Resources and Agriculture |
Same As/Similar To
H2818 (Similar To) 2022-08-29 - Accompanied a study order, see H5043
S596 (Similar To) 2022-03-03 - Accompanied a study order, see S2734
S1467 (Similar To) 2022-02-14 - Accompanied a study order, see S2692
H5041 (Replaced by) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S596 (Similar To) 2022-03-03 - Accompanied a study order, see S2734
S1467 (Similar To) 2022-02-14 - Accompanied a study order, see S2692
H5041 (Replaced by) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H853 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H853.pdf |