MA H86 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on March 1 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-11-21 - Joint session held and dissolved
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 1 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-11-21 - Joint session held and dissolved
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
By Mr. O'Day of West Boylston, a petition of James J. O'Day and Sean Garballey for a legislative amendment to the Constitution to provide resources for education and transportation through an additional tax on incomes in excess of one million dollars. Revenue.
Title
Proposal for a legislative amendment to the Constitution to provide resources for education and transportation through an additional tax on incomes in excess of one million dollars
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-11-21 | Joint | Joint session held and dissolved |
2022-04-11 | Joint | Joint session held and recessed to Monday, November 21, 2022 |
2021-10-25 | Joint | Joint session held and recessed to Monday, April 11, 2022 |
2021-06-09 | Joint | Joint session held and recessed to Monday, October 25, 2021 |
2021-05-12 | Joint | Joint session held and recessed to Wednesday, June 9, 2021 |
2021-05-10 | House | Called for consideration in the joint session |
2021-05-06 | House | Placed on file, in concurrence |
2021-04-29 | Senate | Proposal for Constitutional Amendment reported favorably by committee and placed on file |
2021-04-21 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 04/26/2021 from 02:00 PM-05:00 PM in Written Testimony Only |
2021-03-04 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2021-03-01 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Revenue |
Same As/Similar To
H85 (Similar To) 2021-05-06 - Placed on file, in concurrence
H78 (Similar To) 2021-05-06 - Placed on file, in concurrence
H3657 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H78 (Similar To) 2021-05-06 - Placed on file, in concurrence
H3657 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H86 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H86.pdf |