MA H866 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H5041
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-08-29 - Accompanied a study order, see H5041
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-08-29 - Accompanied a study order, see H5041
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to require the dredging of the harbor area surrounding Houghs Neck in the city of Quincy. Environment, Natural Resources and Agriculture.
Title
Authorizing and directing the director of the Division of Waterways to dredge the harbor area surrounding Houghs Neck in the city of Quincy
Sponsors
Rep. Tackey Chan [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-08-29 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H5041 |
2021-04-27 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 05/04/2021 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2021-03-29 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Environment, Natural Resources and Agriculture |
Same As/Similar To
H1455 (Similar To) 2022-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4844
H848 (Similar To) 2022-08-29 - Accompanied a study order, see H5041
S594 (Similar To) 2022-03-03 - Accompanied a study order, see S2734
S596 (Similar To) 2022-03-03 - Accompanied a study order, see S2734
S598 (Similar To) 2022-03-03 - Accompanied a study order, see S2734
S1342 (Similar To) 2022-01-31 - Accompanied a study order, see S2630
S2342 (Similar To) 2021-11-22 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H5041 (Replaced by) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H848 (Similar To) 2022-08-29 - Accompanied a study order, see H5041
S594 (Similar To) 2022-03-03 - Accompanied a study order, see S2734
S596 (Similar To) 2022-03-03 - Accompanied a study order, see S2734
S598 (Similar To) 2022-03-03 - Accompanied a study order, see S2734
S1342 (Similar To) 2022-01-31 - Accompanied a study order, see S2630
S2342 (Similar To) 2021-11-22 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H5041 (Replaced by) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H866 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H866.pdf |