MA H869 | 2011-2012 | 187th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H3896
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 19-1)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-01-26 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3896
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-01-26 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3896
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to regulate the establishment of municipal lighting plants. Telecommunications, Utilities and Energy.
Title
Relative to the establishment of municipal lighting authorities
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-01-26 | House | Accompanied a new draft, see H3896 |
2011-06-03 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 06/08/2011 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-1 |
2011-01-24 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2011-01-24 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Telecommunications, Utilities and Energy |
Same As/Similar To
H3896 (Replaced by) 2013-01-01 - No further action taken
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/187/House/H869 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/PDF?billId=10701&generalCourtId=1 |