MA H88 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Note: Replaces legislation H87
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 20-5-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 8 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-29 - House NON-concurred
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 8 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-29 - House NON-concurred
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to accountability for vulnerable children and families
Title
Relative to accountability for vulnerable children and families
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-29 | House | House NON-concurred |
2021-03-11 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Children, Families and Persons with Disabilities |
2021-03-08 | House | Read second, ordered to a third reading, rules suspended, read third and passed to be engrossed |
2021-03-08 | House | Rules suspended |
2021-03-08 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting |
2021-03-08 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2021-03-08 | House | New draft of H87 |
2021-03-08 | House | Reported from the committee on House Ways and Means |
Same As/Similar To
H87 (Replaces) 2021-03-08 - Accompanied a new draft, see H88
H239 (Similar To) 2022-09-15 - Accompanied a study order, see H4907
S98 (Similar To) 2022-01-26 - Accompanied a study order, see S2624
S87 (Similar To) 2022-06-30 - New draft substituted, see S2954
S2961 (Similar To) 2022-06-29 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2966
H239 (Similar To) 2022-09-15 - Accompanied a study order, see H4907
S98 (Similar To) 2022-01-26 - Accompanied a study order, see S2624
S87 (Similar To) 2022-06-30 - New draft substituted, see S2954
S2961 (Similar To) 2022-06-29 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2966
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H88 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H88.pdf |