MA H918 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H5160
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-12-01 - Accompanied a study order, see H5160
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-12-01 - Accompanied a study order, see H5160
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to the use of video conferencing for certain mortgages. Financial Services.
Title
Expanding the use of video conferencing
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-12-01 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H5160 |
2019-04-19 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 05/02/2019 from 11:00 AM-01:00 PM in A1 |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2019-01-22 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Financial Services |
Same As/Similar To
H2441 (Similar To) 2020-11-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H5128
H3142 (Similar To) 2019-11-07 - Accompanied H2998
H3072 (Similar To) 2020-11-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H5126
H2994 (Similar To) 2019-11-07 - Accompanied H2998
S2119 (Similar To) 2020-02-24 - Accompanied a study order, see S2560
S2075 (Similar To) 2019-11-18 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H5160 (Replaced by) 2020-12-01 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
H3142 (Similar To) 2019-11-07 - Accompanied H2998
H3072 (Similar To) 2020-11-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H5126
H2994 (Similar To) 2019-11-07 - Accompanied H2998
S2119 (Similar To) 2020-02-24 - Accompanied a study order, see S2560
S2075 (Similar To) 2019-11-18 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H5160 (Replaced by) 2020-12-01 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H918 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H918.pdf |