MA H93 | 2013-2014 | 188th General Court
Note: Replaces legislation S37
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-06-19 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-06-19 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to promote asset development in transitional assistance programs. Children, Families and Persons with Disabilities.
Title
To promote financial stability and asset development
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-06-19 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means |
2013-06-19 | House | Accompanied by S37 |
2013-05-29 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 06/04/2013 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2 |
2013-01-22 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2013-01-22 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Children, Families and Persons with Disabilities |
Same As/Similar To
S37 (Replaces) 2013-06-19 - Accompanied H93
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/188/House/H93 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Document/Bill/188/House/H93.pdf |