MA H937 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H5041
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-0)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-08-29 - Accompanied a study order, see H5041
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-08-29 - Accompanied a study order, see H5041
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to establishing an ecologically based mosquito management program. Environment, Natural Resources and Agriculture.
Title
Providing for the public health by establishing an ecologically based mosquito management program in the Commonwealth
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-08-29 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H5041 |
2021-12-07 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 12/14/2021 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2021-03-29 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Environment, Natural Resources and Agriculture |
Same As/Similar To
S556 (Similar To) 2022-03-03 - Accompanied a study order, see S2734
H2490 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H2345 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - Accompanied a study order, see H5461
H3780 (Similar To) 2022-07-20 - Accompanied a study order, see H4968
H2231 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H5041 (Replaced by) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H2490 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H2345 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - Accompanied a study order, see H5461
H3780 (Similar To) 2022-07-20 - Accompanied a study order, see H4968
H2231 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H5041 (Replaced by) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H937 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H937.pdf |