MA H943 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H5041
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-08-29 - Accompanied a study order, see H5041
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-08-29 - Accompanied a study order, see H5041
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to the installation of septic tank pipes. Environment, Natural Resources and Agriculture.
Title
Relative to septic installers
Sponsors
Rep. Steven Howitt [R] | Rep. Susan Gifford [R] | Rep. John Barrett [D] | Rep. David DeCoste [R] |
Rep. Paul Schmid [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-08-29 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H5041 |
2021-06-01 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 06/08/2021 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2021-03-29 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Environment, Natural Resources and Agriculture |
Same As/Similar To
S1640 (Similar To) 2022-03-21 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H1009 (Similar To) 2022-03-28 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4598
H2789 (Similar To) 2022-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see H4960
S2619 (Similar To) 2022-06-13 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H5041 (Replaced by) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H1009 (Similar To) 2022-03-28 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4598
H2789 (Similar To) 2022-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see H4960
S2619 (Similar To) 2022-06-13 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H5041 (Replaced by) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H943 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H943.pdf |