MA H945 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H5236
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-09-01 - Accompanied a study order, see H5236
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-09-01 - Accompanied a study order, see H5236
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to Department of Conservation and Recreation retained revenue. Environment, Natural Resources and Agriculture.
Title
Relative to DCR retained revenue
Sponsors
Rep. Daniel Hunt [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-09-01 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H5236 |
2022-04-28 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2022-04-04 | House | Reporting date extended to Thursday May 12, 2022, pending concurrence |
2022-03-03 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2022-02-07 | House | Reporting date extended to Thursday March 31, 2022, pending concurrence |
2021-11-30 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 12/07/2021 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2021-03-29 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Environment, Natural Resources and Agriculture |
Same As/Similar To
H4010 (Similar To) 2021-09-30 - Chapter 70 of the Acts of 2021
S2490 (Similar To) 2022-03-03 - Accompanied a study order, see S2734
H1007 (Similar To) 2022-05-16 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2880
H3232 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S535 (Similar To) 2022-07-14 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 106 of the Acts of 2022
H855 (Similar To) 2022-08-29 - Accompanied a study order, see H5041
H5236 (Replaced by) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S2418 (Similar To) 2022-02-14 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S2490 (Similar To) 2022-03-03 - Accompanied a study order, see S2734
H1007 (Similar To) 2022-05-16 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2880
H3232 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S535 (Similar To) 2022-07-14 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 106 of the Acts of 2022
H855 (Similar To) 2022-08-29 - Accompanied a study order, see H5041
H5236 (Replaced by) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S2418 (Similar To) 2022-02-14 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H945 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H945.pdf |