MA H951 | 2011-2012 | 187th General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-01-01 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-01-01 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to exempt the weight of idle reduction systems for commercial vehicles from maximum weight restrictions. Transportation.
Title
To exempt the weight of idle reduction systems for commercial vehicles from maximum weight restrictions
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-01-01 | House | No further action taken |
2012-06-25 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting for a second reading |
2012-06-07 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2012-01-25 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 06/14/2011 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in B-2 |
2011-01-24 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2011-01-24 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Transportation |
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/187/House/H951 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/PDF?billId=9822&generalCourtId=1 |