MA H953 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H5041
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-08-29 - Accompanied a study order, see H5041
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-08-29 - Accompanied a study order, see H5041
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to establish a special commission (including members of the General Court) to study the affects of offshore wind projects on Massachusetts fisheries. Environment, Natural Resources and Agriculture.
Title
Resolve providing for a commission to study the affects of offshore wind projects on Massachusetts fisheries
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-08-29 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H5041 |
2021-09-14 | Joint | Location Changed - Hearing scheduled for 09/22/2021 from 02:00 PM-05:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-09-14 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 09/22/2021 from 02:00 PM-05:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2021-03-29 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Environment, Natural Resources and Agriculture |
Same As/Similar To
H911 (Similar To) 2022-08-29 - Accompanied a study order, see H5041
S1105 (Similar To) 2022-02-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2665
H976 (Similar To) 2022-08-29 - Accompanied a study order, see H5041
S614 (Similar To) 2022-03-03 - Accompanied a study order, see S2734
S2154 (Similar To) 2022-08-08 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
S546 (Similar To) 2022-03-07 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H4515 (Similar To) 2022-03-03 - Published as amended, see H4524
H4524 (Similar To) 2022-07-21 - Reported by H5060
H5041 (Replaced by) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H3310 (Similar To) 2022-01-24 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4348
H2924 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H3266 (Similar To) 2022-08-29 - Accompanied a study order, see H5042
S1105 (Similar To) 2022-02-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2665
H976 (Similar To) 2022-08-29 - Accompanied a study order, see H5041
S614 (Similar To) 2022-03-03 - Accompanied a study order, see S2734
S2154 (Similar To) 2022-08-08 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
S546 (Similar To) 2022-03-07 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H4515 (Similar To) 2022-03-03 - Published as amended, see H4524
H4524 (Similar To) 2022-07-21 - Reported by H5060
H5041 (Replaced by) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H3310 (Similar To) 2022-01-24 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4348
H2924 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H3266 (Similar To) 2022-08-29 - Accompanied a study order, see H5042
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H953 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H953.pdf |