MA H991 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation relative to the use of crossbows in hunting. Environment, Natural Resources and Agriculture.
Title
Relative to the use of crossbows in hunting
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-01-03 | House | No further action taken |
2022-03-24 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means |
2022-03-24 | House | Accompanied by S536 and H1024 |
2021-12-28 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 01/04/2022 from 01:00 PM-06:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2021-03-29 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Environment, Natural Resources and Agriculture |
Same As/Similar To
S536 (Similar To) 2022-03-24 - Accompanied H991
H1024 (Similar To) 2022-03-24 - Accompanied H991
H4442 (Similar To) 2022-08-04 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 145 of the Acts of 2022
H1024 (Similar To) 2022-03-24 - Accompanied H991
H4442 (Similar To) 2022-08-04 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 145 of the Acts of 2022
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H991 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H991.pdf |