MA S1000 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2490
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-26 - Accompanied a study order, see S2490
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-26 - Accompanied a study order, see S2490
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to establish fair scheduling practices for employees in the Commonwealth. Labor and Workforce Development.
Title
Establishing fair scheduling practices for employees in the Commonwealth
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-26 | Senate | Accompanied a study order, see S2490 |
2017-01-23 | House | House concurred |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Labor and Workforce Development |
Same As/Similar To
S1701 (Similar To) 2018-05-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H4481
S1430 (Similar To) 2018-03-05 - Accompanied H2564
S1442 (Similar To) 2018-03-01 - Accompanied H1390
S1400 (Similar To) 2018-03-26 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1402 (Similar To) 2018-04-26 - Accompanied a study order, see S2491
H1375 (Similar To) 2018-06-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4654
H2545 (Similar To) 2018-06-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4654
S1734 (Similar To) 2018-05-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H4481
H1007 (Similar To) 2018-04-19 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4418
H1442 (Similar To) 2018-06-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4654
H1452 (Similar To) 2018-06-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4654
H1001 (Similar To) 2018-07-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H4729
H1345 (Similar To) 2018-06-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4654
H226 (Similar To) 2018-07-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4706
H3802 (Similar To) 2018-07-23 - Accompanied a study order, see H4792
H1390 (Similar To) 2018-07-30 - Chapter 160 of the Acts of 2018
H1698 (Similar To) 2018-05-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H4481
H1723 (Similar To) 2018-05-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H4481
H1371 (Similar To) 2018-06-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4654
H2533 (Similar To) 2018-06-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4654
S2490 (Replaced by) 2018-07-12 - Reported (in part) by S1014
H4556 (Similar To) 2018-06-04 - See H1390
S1430 (Similar To) 2018-03-05 - Accompanied H2564
S1442 (Similar To) 2018-03-01 - Accompanied H1390
S1400 (Similar To) 2018-03-26 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1402 (Similar To) 2018-04-26 - Accompanied a study order, see S2491
H1375 (Similar To) 2018-06-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4654
H2545 (Similar To) 2018-06-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4654
S1734 (Similar To) 2018-05-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H4481
H1007 (Similar To) 2018-04-19 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4418
H1442 (Similar To) 2018-06-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4654
H1452 (Similar To) 2018-06-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4654
H1001 (Similar To) 2018-07-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H4729
H1345 (Similar To) 2018-06-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4654
H226 (Similar To) 2018-07-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4706
H3802 (Similar To) 2018-07-23 - Accompanied a study order, see H4792
H1390 (Similar To) 2018-07-30 - Chapter 160 of the Acts of 2018
H1698 (Similar To) 2018-05-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H4481
H1723 (Similar To) 2018-05-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H4481
H1371 (Similar To) 2018-06-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4654
H2533 (Similar To) 2018-06-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4654
S2490 (Replaced by) 2018-07-12 - Reported (in part) by S1014
H4556 (Similar To) 2018-06-04 - See H1390
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/S1000 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/S1000.pdf |