MA S1001 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2496
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-03 - Accompanied a study order, see S2496
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-03 - Accompanied a study order, see S2496
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to improve the quality of courthouse security. The Judiciary.
Title
Improving the quality of courthouse security
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-03 | Senate | Accompanied a study order, see S2496 |
2019-11-05 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 11/12/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-1 & A-2 |
2019-01-22 | House | House concurred |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on The Judiciary |
Same As/Similar To
H3398 (Similar To) 2020-11-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5081
S999 (Similar To) 2020-02-13 - Accompanied H3567
S1417 (Similar To) 2020-02-27 - Accompanied a study order, see S2565
S1420 (Similar To) 2020-02-27 - Accompanied a study order, see S2565
S1319 (Similar To) 2020-06-18 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H2072 (Similar To) 2020-03-02 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
H2822 (Similar To) 2020-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H4405
H2089 (Similar To) 2020-11-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H5117
S2496 (Replaced by) 2020-02-06 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
S999 (Similar To) 2020-02-13 - Accompanied H3567
S1417 (Similar To) 2020-02-27 - Accompanied a study order, see S2565
S1420 (Similar To) 2020-02-27 - Accompanied a study order, see S2565
S1319 (Similar To) 2020-06-18 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H2072 (Similar To) 2020-03-02 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
H2822 (Similar To) 2020-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H4405
H2089 (Similar To) 2020-11-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H5117
S2496 (Replaced by) 2020-02-06 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S1001 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S1001.pdf |