MA S1024 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2496
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-03 - Accompanied a study order, see S2496
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-03 - Accompanied a study order, see S2496
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to streamline zoning appeals. The Judiciary.
Title
To streamline zoning appeals
Sponsors
Sen. Bruce Tarr [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-03 | Senate | Accompanied a study order, see S2496 |
2019-07-08 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 07/16/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-1 |
2019-01-22 | House | House concurred |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on The Judiciary |
Same As/Similar To
H1833 (Similar To) 2020-04-23 - Reporting date extended to Friday June 5, 2020, pending concurrence
S2124 (Similar To) 2019-06-10 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H1800 (Similar To) 2020-11-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H5127
H3612 (Similar To) 2020-02-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4449
S2496 (Replaced by) 2020-02-06 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
S2124 (Similar To) 2019-06-10 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H1800 (Similar To) 2020-11-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H5127
H3612 (Similar To) 2020-02-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4449
S2496 (Replaced by) 2020-02-06 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S1024 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S1024.pdf |