MA S1025 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4272
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on April 15 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-05-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4272
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 15 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-05-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4272
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation relative to the Department of Mental Health's citizen boards. Mental Health and Substance Abuse.
Title
Regarding the Department of Mental Health's citizen boards
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-09 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H4272 |
2015-06-18 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 06/29/2015 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2 |
2015-04-15 | House | House concurred |
2015-04-15 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Mental Health and Substance Abuse |
Same As/Similar To
H4272 (Replaced by) 2016-05-09 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
S796 (Similar To) 2016-04-04 - Accompanied a study order, see S2204
S849 (Similar To) 2016-04-04 - Accompanied a study order, see S2204
S1046 (Similar To) 2016-05-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4272
S2322 (Similar To) 2017-01-13 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 437 of the Acts of 2016
H1805 (Similar To) 2016-09-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H4635
H1806 (Similar To) 2016-09-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H4635
H1812 (Similar To) 2016-09-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H4635
S796 (Similar To) 2016-04-04 - Accompanied a study order, see S2204
S849 (Similar To) 2016-04-04 - Accompanied a study order, see S2204
S1046 (Similar To) 2016-05-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4272
S2322 (Similar To) 2017-01-13 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 437 of the Acts of 2016
H1805 (Similar To) 2016-09-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H4635
H1806 (Similar To) 2016-09-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H4635
H1812 (Similar To) 2016-09-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H4635
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/S1025 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/S1025.pdf |