MA H4272 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court
Note: For complete list of accompanied drafts and orders please see the SAST list.
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on May 9 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-05-09 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 9 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-05-09 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Behavioral health bills
Title
Behavioral health bills
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-09 | House | Discharged to the committee on House Rules |
2016-05-09 | House | Order reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Joint Rules |
2016-05-09 | House | Accompanied by S1025, S1026, S1030, S1032, S1033, S1034, S1035, S1036, S1037, S1038, S1040, S1041, S1042, S1045, S1046, S1047, S1049, S1050, S1052, S1053, S1054, S1055, H1790, H1791, H1792, H1794, H1797, H1800, H1801, H1803, H1813, H1824, H3265, H3459 and H3811 |
2016-05-09 | House | Reported from the committee on Mental Health and Substance Abuse |
Same As/Similar To
S1025 (Replaces) 2016-05-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4272
S1026 (Replaces) 2016-05-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4272
S1030 (Replaces) 2016-05-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4272
S1032 (Replaces) 2016-05-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4272
S1033 (Replaces) 2016-05-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4272
S1034 (Replaces) 2016-05-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4272
S1035 (Replaces) 2016-05-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4272
S1036 (Replaces) 2016-05-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4272
S1037 (Replaces) 2016-05-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4272
S1038 (Replaces) 2016-05-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4272
S1040 (Replaces) 2016-05-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4272
S1041 (Replaces) 2016-05-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4272
S1042 (Replaces) 2016-05-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4272
S1045 (Replaces) 2016-05-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4272
S1046 (Replaces) 2016-05-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4272
S1047 (Replaces) 2016-05-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4272
S1049 (Replaces) 2016-05-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4272
S1050 (Replaces) 2016-05-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4272
S1052 (Replaces) 2016-05-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4272
S1053 (Replaces) 2016-05-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4272
S1054 (Replaces) 2016-05-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4272
S1055 (Replaces) 2016-05-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4272
H1790 (Replaces) 2016-05-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4272
H1791 (Replaces) 2016-05-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4272
H1792 (Replaces) 2016-05-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4272
H1794 (Replaces) 2016-05-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4272
H1797 (Replaces) 2016-05-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4272
H1800 (Replaces) 2016-05-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4272
H1801 (Replaces) 2016-05-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4272
H1803 (Replaces) 2016-05-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4272
H1813 (Replaces) 2016-05-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4272
H1824 (Replaces) 2016-05-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4272
H3265 (Replaces) 2016-05-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4272
H3459 (Replaces) 2016-05-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4272
H3811 (Replaces) 2016-05-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4272
H3926 (Similar To) 2016-01-13 - New draft substituted, see H3944
H4128 (Similar To) 2016-07-28 - Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting for a second reading
H4662 (Similar To) 2016-09-29 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
H4637 (Similar To) 2016-09-26 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
S2072 (Similar To) 2016-05-12 - New draft substituted, see S2292
S1026 (Replaces) 2016-05-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4272
S1030 (Replaces) 2016-05-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4272
S1032 (Replaces) 2016-05-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4272
S1033 (Replaces) 2016-05-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4272
S1034 (Replaces) 2016-05-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4272
S1035 (Replaces) 2016-05-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4272
S1036 (Replaces) 2016-05-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4272
S1037 (Replaces) 2016-05-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4272
S1038 (Replaces) 2016-05-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4272
S1040 (Replaces) 2016-05-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4272
S1041 (Replaces) 2016-05-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4272
S1042 (Replaces) 2016-05-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4272
S1045 (Replaces) 2016-05-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4272
S1046 (Replaces) 2016-05-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4272
S1047 (Replaces) 2016-05-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4272
S1049 (Replaces) 2016-05-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4272
S1050 (Replaces) 2016-05-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4272
S1052 (Replaces) 2016-05-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4272
S1053 (Replaces) 2016-05-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4272
S1054 (Replaces) 2016-05-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4272
S1055 (Replaces) 2016-05-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4272
H1790 (Replaces) 2016-05-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4272
H1791 (Replaces) 2016-05-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4272
H1792 (Replaces) 2016-05-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4272
H1794 (Replaces) 2016-05-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4272
H1797 (Replaces) 2016-05-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4272
H1800 (Replaces) 2016-05-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4272
H1801 (Replaces) 2016-05-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4272
H1803 (Replaces) 2016-05-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4272
H1813 (Replaces) 2016-05-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4272
H1824 (Replaces) 2016-05-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4272
H3265 (Replaces) 2016-05-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4272
H3459 (Replaces) 2016-05-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4272
H3811 (Replaces) 2016-05-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4272
H3926 (Similar To) 2016-01-13 - New draft substituted, see H3944
H4128 (Similar To) 2016-07-28 - Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting for a second reading
H4662 (Similar To) 2016-09-29 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
H4637 (Similar To) 2016-09-26 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
S2072 (Similar To) 2016-05-12 - New draft substituted, see S2292
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H4272 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H4272.pdf |