MA S1052 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4272
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on April 15 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-05-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4272
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 15 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-05-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4272
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation relative to the civil commitment for alcoholism or substance abuse at certain facilities. Mental Health and Substance Abuse.
Title
Relative to the civil commitment for alcoholism or substance abuse at certain facilities
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-09 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H4272 |
2015-06-03 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 06/08/2015 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2 |
2015-04-15 | House | House concurred |
2015-04-15 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Mental Health and Substance Abuse |
Same As/Similar To
H4272 (Replaced by) 2016-05-09 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
S989 (Similar To) 2016-05-12 - New draft substituted, see S2283
S921 (Similar To) 2016-04-04 - Accompanied a study order, see S2204
S284 (Similar To) 2016-06-23 - Accompanied a study order, see S2356
S1044 (Similar To) 2016-02-04 - Accompanied H1795
S1502 (Similar To) 2016-07-15 - New draft substituted, see S2432
S2020 (Similar To) 2015-10-01 - Passed to be engrossed - Roll Call #173 [YEAS 38 - NAYS 0]
S993 (Similar To) 2016-04-13 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S905 (Similar To) 2016-07-08 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2417
S996 (Similar To) 2016-09-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H4605
S989 (Similar To) 2016-05-12 - New draft substituted, see S2283
S921 (Similar To) 2016-04-04 - Accompanied a study order, see S2204
S284 (Similar To) 2016-06-23 - Accompanied a study order, see S2356
S1044 (Similar To) 2016-02-04 - Accompanied H1795
S1502 (Similar To) 2016-07-15 - New draft substituted, see S2432
S2020 (Similar To) 2015-10-01 - Passed to be engrossed - Roll Call #173 [YEAS 38 - NAYS 0]
S993 (Similar To) 2016-04-13 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S905 (Similar To) 2016-07-08 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2417
S996 (Similar To) 2016-09-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H4605
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/S1052 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/S1052.pdf |