MA S1042 | 2013-2014 | 188th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2114
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 22 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-28 - Accompanied a study order, see S2114
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-28 - Accompanied a study order, see S2114
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to allow out-of-state physicians to order home care in the Commonwealth. Public Health.
Title
To allow out-of-state physicians to order home care in the Commonwealth
Sponsors
Sen. Michael Knapik [R] | Sen. Benjamin Downing [D] | Sen. Richard Ross [R] | Rep. James Murphy [D] |
Rep. Kay Khan [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-28 | Senate | Accompanied a study order, see S2114 |
2013-10-23 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 10/29/2013 from 10:00 AM-04:00 PM in B-1 |
2013-01-22 | House | House concurred |
2013-01-22 | Senate | Referred to the Senate Committee on Public Health |
Same As/Similar To
S2114 (Replaced by) 2015-01-06 - No further action taken
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/188/Senate/S1042 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Document/Bill/188/Senate/S1042.pdf |