MA S1050 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-28 - Accompanied H1903
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-28 - Accompanied H1903
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation relative to the composition of the victim and witness assistance board. The Judiciary.
Title
Relative to the composition of the victim and witness assistance board
Sponsors
Sen. Adam Gomez [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-28 | House | Accompanied H1903 |
2021-07-20 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 07/27/2021 from 10:00 AM-02:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-03-29 | House | House concurred |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on The Judiciary |
Same As/Similar To
S1012 (Similar To) 2022-02-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2665
H1903 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H751 (Similar To) 2022-07-20 - Accompanied a study order, see H5029
H1903 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H751 (Similar To) 2022-07-20 - Accompanied a study order, see H5029
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/S1050 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/S1050.pdf |