MA S1052 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-22 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-22 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to reinvest justice and opportunity in communities affected by incarceration. Labor and Workforce Development.
Title
To reinvest justice and opportunity in communities affected by incarceration
Sponsors
Sen. Sonia Chang-Diaz [D] | Rep. Mary Keefe [D] | Sen. Jason Lewis [D] | Rep. Kay Khan [D] |
Sen. Salvatore DiDomenico [D] | Rep. David LeBoeuf [D] | Sen. James Eldridge [D] | Rep. Nika Elugardo [D] |
Sen. Julian Cyr [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-22 | Senate | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means |
2020-04-27 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2020-03-30 | House | Reporting date extended to Friday June 5, 2020, pending concurrence |
2020-02-05 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2020-01-30 | House | Reporting date extended to Monday April 6, 2020, pending concurrence |
2019-04-19 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 04/30/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2 |
2019-01-22 | House | House concurred |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Labor and Workforce Development |
Same As/Similar To
H3492 (Similar To) 2020-03-30 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
S95 (Similar To) 2020-02-13 - Accompanied a study order, see S2533
S815 (Similar To) 2020-03-12 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S344 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2538
H3107 (Similar To) 2019-11-07 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H341 (Similar To) 2020-10-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H5043
S1928 (Similar To) 2020-02-20 - Accompanied a study order, see S2552
H2244 (Similar To) 2020-05-20 - Accompanied a study order, see H4722
S493 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2540
H1064 (Similar To) 2020-12-01 - Accompanied a study order, see H5160
H184 (Similar To) 2020-02-24 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting, the question being on acceptance
H183 (Similar To) 2020-02-24 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting, the question being on acceptance
H3306 (Similar To) 2020-11-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5081
S2195 (Similar To) 2019-06-27 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 27 of the Acts of 2019
S2225 (Similar To) 2020-02-27 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4468
H3974 (Similar To) 2019-09-16 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4073
H4016 (Similar To) 2019-08-01 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 50 of the Acts of 2019
H4061 (Similar To) 2020-03-19 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 44 of the Acts of 2020
H4097 (Similar To) 2020-01-16 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 7 of the Acts of 2020
S95 (Similar To) 2020-02-13 - Accompanied a study order, see S2533
S815 (Similar To) 2020-03-12 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S344 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2538
H3107 (Similar To) 2019-11-07 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H341 (Similar To) 2020-10-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H5043
S1928 (Similar To) 2020-02-20 - Accompanied a study order, see S2552
H2244 (Similar To) 2020-05-20 - Accompanied a study order, see H4722
S493 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2540
H1064 (Similar To) 2020-12-01 - Accompanied a study order, see H5160
H184 (Similar To) 2020-02-24 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting, the question being on acceptance
H183 (Similar To) 2020-02-24 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting, the question being on acceptance
H3306 (Similar To) 2020-11-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5081
S2195 (Similar To) 2019-06-27 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 27 of the Acts of 2019
S2225 (Similar To) 2020-02-27 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4468
H3974 (Similar To) 2019-09-16 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4073
H4016 (Similar To) 2019-08-01 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 50 of the Acts of 2019
H4061 (Similar To) 2020-03-19 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 44 of the Acts of 2020
H4097 (Similar To) 2020-01-16 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 7 of the Acts of 2020
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S1052 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S1052.pdf |