MA S1061 | 2013-2014 | 188th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2114
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-28 - Accompanied a study order, see S2114
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-28 - Accompanied a study order, see S2114
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to prohibit the use of all latex gloves and products by persons who handle food. Public Health.
Title
Prohibiting the use of all latex gloves and products by persons who handle food
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-28 | Senate | Accompanied a study order, see S2114 |
2013-05-13 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 06/11/2013 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-1 |
2013-01-22 | House | House concurred |
2013-01-22 | Senate | Referred to the Senate Committee on Public Health |
Same As/Similar To
S2114 (Replaced by) 2015-01-06 - No further action taken
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/188/Senate/S1061 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Document/Bill/188/Senate/S1061.pdf |