MA S1063 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on April 15 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-04-11 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 15 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-04-11 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to authorize municipal use of the prudent investor standards. Municipalities and Regional Government.
Title
Authorizing municipal use of the prudent investor standards
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-11 | Senate | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means |
2015-07-09 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 07/16/2015 from 01:00 PM-03:00 PM in B-2 |
2015-04-15 | House | House concurred |
2015-04-15 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Municipalities and Regional Government |
Same As/Similar To
S1062 (Similar To) 2016-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see S2385
S743 (Similar To) 2016-04-04 - Accompanied a study order, see S2204
H242 (Similar To) 2016-08-15 - Accompanied a study order, see H4578
S1220 (Similar To) 2016-07-28 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2468
S616 (Similar To) 2016-06-23 - Accompanied a study order, see S2356
S872 (Similar To) 2016-07-23 - New draft substituted, see S2444
S1686 (Similar To) 2016-04-19 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1186 (Similar To) 2016-03-28 - Accompanied a study order, see S2199
S526 (Similar To) 2016-06-06 - Accompanied a study order, see S2318
S1206 (Similar To) 2016-06-23 - Accompanied a study order, see S2356
S370 (Similar To) 2016-09-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H4620
S439 (Similar To) 2016-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see S2380
S457 (Similar To) 2016-06-09 - New draft substituted, see S2309
S972 (Similar To) 2015-06-15 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S437 (Similar To) 2015-11-25 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1004 (Similar To) 2016-06-16 - Report accepted
S743 (Similar To) 2016-04-04 - Accompanied a study order, see S2204
H242 (Similar To) 2016-08-15 - Accompanied a study order, see H4578
S1220 (Similar To) 2016-07-28 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2468
S616 (Similar To) 2016-06-23 - Accompanied a study order, see S2356
S872 (Similar To) 2016-07-23 - New draft substituted, see S2444
S1686 (Similar To) 2016-04-19 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1186 (Similar To) 2016-03-28 - Accompanied a study order, see S2199
S526 (Similar To) 2016-06-06 - Accompanied a study order, see S2318
S1206 (Similar To) 2016-06-23 - Accompanied a study order, see S2356
S370 (Similar To) 2016-09-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H4620
S439 (Similar To) 2016-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see S2380
S457 (Similar To) 2016-06-09 - New draft substituted, see S2309
S972 (Similar To) 2015-06-15 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S437 (Similar To) 2015-11-25 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1004 (Similar To) 2016-06-16 - Report accepted
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/S1063 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/S1063.pdf |