MA S1071 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2488
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-2)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-26 - Accompanied a study order, see S2488
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-26 - Accompanied a study order, see S2488
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation relative to youth marijuana use prevention and education. Marijuana Policy.
Title
Relative to youth marijuana use prevention and education
Sponsors
Sen. Jason Lewis [D] | Rep. Joseph McKenna [R] | Sen. Richard Ross [R] | Rep. Steven Ultrino [D] |
Rep. Jack Lewis [D] | Rep. Colleen Garry [D] | Rep. Kay Khan [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-26 | Senate | Accompanied a study order, see S2488 |
2018-01-31 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 02/06/2018 from 01:00 PM-03:00 PM in B-2 |
2017-03-31 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 04/03/2017 from 11:00 AM-05:00 PM in A1 & A2 |
2017-01-23 | House | House concurred |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Marijuana Policy |
Same As/Similar To
S224 (Similar To) 2018-03-09 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2325
S193 (Similar To) 2018-04-26 - Accompanied a study order, see S2486
S317 (Similar To) 2018-04-17 - Accompanied a study order, see S2426
S273 (Similar To) 2018-04-17 - Accompanied a study order, see S2424
S232 (Similar To) 2017-05-18 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2070
S1383 (Similar To) 2018-04-26 - Accompanied a study order, see S2491
S2000 (Similar To) 2018-02-12 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S706 (Similar To) 2017-06-08 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2081
S239 (Similar To) 2018-05-21 - Accompanied H2056
H648 (Similar To) 2017-06-08 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2081
H226 (Similar To) 2018-07-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4706
H306 (Similar To) 2018-02-15 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2306
S2081 (Similar To) 2017-11-02 - New draft substituted, as amended, see S2191
H332 (Similar To) 2018-04-11 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4390
S1025 (Similar To) 2018-04-26 - Accompanied a study order, see S2491
H507 (Similar To) 2018-03-29 - Read and referred to the committee on Senate Rules
H630 (Similar To) 2017-06-08 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2081
H646 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H977 (Similar To) 2018-08-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4874
H3926 (Similar To) 2018-07-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4707
S2173 (Similar To) 2018-01-12 - Hearing scheduled for 01/16/2018 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-1
H12 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H19 (Similar To) 2019-01-10 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 439 of the Acts of 2018
H40 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H3776 (Similar To) 2017-07-17 - Reported by H3818
S2258 (Similar To) 2018-01-25 - Referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S2256 (Similar To) 2018-01-25 - Referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S2488 (Replaced by) 2018-05-14 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
S193 (Similar To) 2018-04-26 - Accompanied a study order, see S2486
S317 (Similar To) 2018-04-17 - Accompanied a study order, see S2426
S273 (Similar To) 2018-04-17 - Accompanied a study order, see S2424
S232 (Similar To) 2017-05-18 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2070
S1383 (Similar To) 2018-04-26 - Accompanied a study order, see S2491
S2000 (Similar To) 2018-02-12 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S706 (Similar To) 2017-06-08 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2081
S239 (Similar To) 2018-05-21 - Accompanied H2056
H648 (Similar To) 2017-06-08 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2081
H226 (Similar To) 2018-07-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4706
H306 (Similar To) 2018-02-15 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2306
S2081 (Similar To) 2017-11-02 - New draft substituted, as amended, see S2191
H332 (Similar To) 2018-04-11 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4390
S1025 (Similar To) 2018-04-26 - Accompanied a study order, see S2491
H507 (Similar To) 2018-03-29 - Read and referred to the committee on Senate Rules
H630 (Similar To) 2017-06-08 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2081
H646 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H977 (Similar To) 2018-08-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4874
H3926 (Similar To) 2018-07-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4707
S2173 (Similar To) 2018-01-12 - Hearing scheduled for 01/16/2018 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-1
H12 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H19 (Similar To) 2019-01-10 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 439 of the Acts of 2018
H40 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H3776 (Similar To) 2017-07-17 - Reported by H3818
S2258 (Similar To) 2018-01-25 - Referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S2256 (Similar To) 2018-01-25 - Referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S2488 (Replaced by) 2018-05-14 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/S1071 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/S1071.pdf |