MA S1074 | 2011-2012 | 187th General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-26 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred committee on Senate Ethics and Rules
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-26 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred committee on Senate Ethics and Rules
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to regulate cadmium in children's jewelry. Public Health.
Title
Regulating cadmium in children's jewelry
Sponsors
Sen. Gale Candaras [D] | Rep. Cory Atkins [D] | Rep. Jennifer Benson [D] | Sen. Thomas McGee [D] |
Rep. Angelo Puppolo [D] | Rep. Denise Provost [D] | Rep. Benjamin Swan [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-26 | Senate | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred committee on Senate Ethics and Rules |
2011-09-06 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 09/13/2011 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-1 |
2011-01-24 | House | House concurred. |
2011-01-24 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Public Health. |
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/187/Senate/S1074 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/PDF?billId=12482&generalCourtId=1 |