MA S1076 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2665
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2665
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2665
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation relative to visitation and family court matters in domestic violence cases. The Judiciary.
Title
Relative to visitation and family court matters in domestic violence cases
Sponsors
Sen. Jason Lewis [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-07 | Senate | Accompanied a study order, see S2665 |
2021-11-02 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 11/09/2021 from 10:00 AM-02:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-03-29 | House | House concurred |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on The Judiciary |
Same As/Similar To
H1659 (Similar To) 2022-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4844
S1023 (Similar To) 2022-02-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2665
S190 (Similar To) 2022-02-10 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2678
S176 (Similar To) 2022-02-10 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2678
S2665 (Replaced by) 2022-02-10 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
S1023 (Similar To) 2022-02-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2665
S190 (Similar To) 2022-02-10 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2678
S176 (Similar To) 2022-02-10 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2678
S2665 (Replaced by) 2022-02-10 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/S1076 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/S1076.pdf |