MA S1116 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2314
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-08-05 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2314
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-08-05 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2314
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation relative to snow removal service liability limitation. Labor and Workforce Development.
Title
Relative to snow removal service liability limitation
Sponsors
Sen. Bruce Tarr [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-08-05 | Senate | Accompanied a new draft, see S2314 |
2019-06-27 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 07/09/2019 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in B-1 |
2019-01-22 | House | House concurred |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Labor and Workforce Development |
Same As/Similar To
S545 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2543
H1005 (Similar To) 2020-12-01 - Accompanied a study order, see H5160
S2314 (Replaced by) 2019-08-05 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H1005 (Similar To) 2020-12-01 - Accompanied a study order, see H5160
S2314 (Replaced by) 2019-08-05 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S1116 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S1116.pdf |