MA S1135 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-04-23 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-04-23 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to transfer Bridgewater State Hospital from the Department of Corrections to the Department of Mental Health. Mental Health, Substance Use and Recovery.
Title
To transfer Bridgewater State Hospital from the Department of Corrections to the Department of Mental Health
Sponsors
Sen. Cynthia Creem [D] | Rep. Ruth Balser [D] | Sen. John Keenan [D] | Rep. Lindsay Sabadosa [D] |
Rep. Sean Garballey [D] | Sen. Patricia Jehlen [D] | Sen. Michael Barrett [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-23 | Senate | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means |
2019-09-19 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 09/26/2019 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in B-1 |
2019-01-22 | House | House concurred |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Mental Health, Substance Use and Recovery |
Same As/Similar To
H1698 (Similar To) 2020-02-20 - Accompanied a study order, see H4450
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S1135 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S1135.pdf |