MA S1192 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-06 - Accompanied H3237
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-06 - Accompanied H3237
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to modernize emergency medical services oversight. Public Health.
Title
Modernizing emergency medical services oversight
Sponsors
Sen. Kenneth Donnelly [D] | Rep. Frank Moran [D] | Sen. Michael Brady [D] | Sen. Patrick O'Connor [R] |
Rep. Daniel Ryan [D] | Rep. Paul Heroux [D] | Rep. Michelle DuBois [D] | Sen. Jennifer Flanagan [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-06 | House | Accompanied H3237 |
2018-04-26 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2018-04-24 | House | Reporting date extended to Wednesday May 16, 2018, pending concurrence |
2018-04-02 | Senate | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the Joint Committee on Health Care Financing |
2017-11-14 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 11/28/2017 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2 |
2017-01-23 | House | House concurred |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Public Health |
Same As/Similar To
S1362 (Similar To) 2018-02-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2292
S1743 (Similar To) 2018-02-15 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S737 (Similar To) 2018-04-09 - Accompanied a study order, see S2404
S1297 (Similar To) 2018-03-01 - Accompanied a study order, see S2313
S1735 (Similar To) 2018-05-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H4481
H215 (Similar To) 2018-06-07 - Accompanied a study order, see H4584
H1277 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H3237 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H5 (Similar To) 2017-12-11 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4061
S1743 (Similar To) 2018-02-15 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S737 (Similar To) 2018-04-09 - Accompanied a study order, see S2404
S1297 (Similar To) 2018-03-01 - Accompanied a study order, see S2313
S1735 (Similar To) 2018-05-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H4481
H215 (Similar To) 2018-06-07 - Accompanied a study order, see H4584
H1277 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H3237 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H5 (Similar To) 2017-12-11 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4061
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/S1192 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/S1192.pdf |