MA S1206 | 2013-2014 | 188th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2113
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-28 - Accompanied a study order, see S2113
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-28 - Accompanied a study order, see S2113
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to authorize the Massachusetts Teachers Retirement System to grant creditable service to Sheila Blair. Public Service.
Title
Authorizing the Massachusetts Teachers' Retirement System to grant creditable service to Sheila Blair
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-28 | Senate | Accompanied a study order, see S2113 |
2014-02-18 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 01/14/2014 from 11:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-1 |
2013-01-22 | House | House concurred |
2013-01-22 | Senate | Referred to the Senate Committee on Public Service |
Same As/Similar To
S2113 (Replaced by) 2015-01-06 - No further action taken
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/188/Senate/S1206 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Document/Bill/188/Senate/S1206.pdf |