MA S1218 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2547
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-20 - Accompanied a study order, see S2547
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-20 - Accompanied a study order, see S2547
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation relative to sharps stewardship. Public Health.
Title
Relative to sharps stewardship
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-20 | Senate | Accompanied a study order, see S2547 |
2019-09-12 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 09/24/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2 |
2019-01-22 | House | House concurred |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Public Health |
Same As/Similar To
S728 (Similar To) 2020-07-23 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
H3398 (Similar To) 2020-11-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5081
H898 (Similar To) 2020-12-01 - Accompanied a study order, see H5160
H1972 (Similar To) 2020-02-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4449
S570 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2543
H1981 (Similar To) 2020-02-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4449
H1713 (Similar To) 2020-03-09 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4533
S721 (Similar To) 2020-07-23 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
S2547 (Replaced by) 2020-02-24 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
H3398 (Similar To) 2020-11-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5081
H898 (Similar To) 2020-12-01 - Accompanied a study order, see H5160
H1972 (Similar To) 2020-02-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4449
S570 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2543
H1981 (Similar To) 2020-02-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4449
H1713 (Similar To) 2020-03-09 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4533
S721 (Similar To) 2020-07-23 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
S2547 (Replaced by) 2020-02-24 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S1218 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S1218.pdf |