MA S1219 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-28 - Senate concurred
Pending: Joint Labor and Workforce Development Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-28 - Senate concurred
Pending: Joint Labor and Workforce Development Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to establish a standard for prevention of heat illness in outdoor public sector workers. Labor and Workforce Development.
Title
To establish a standard for prevention of heat illness in outdoor public sector workers
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-28 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2024-02-08 | House | Reporting date extended to Wednesday May 8, 2024, pending concurrence |
2023-09-29 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 10/10/2023 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in A-1 |
2023-02-16 | House | House concurred |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Labor and Workforce Development |
Same As/Similar To
S2480 (Similar To) 2023-10-30 - Read; and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H4241 (Similar To) 2024-06-12 - Reported by H4744
S2578 (Similar To) 2024-04-22 - Bill recommended ought to pass and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H4351 (Similar To) 2024-02-12 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H4744 (Similar To) 2024-06-20 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 118 of the Acts of 2024
H4241 (Similar To) 2024-06-12 - Reported by H4744
S2578 (Similar To) 2024-04-22 - Bill recommended ought to pass and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H4351 (Similar To) 2024-02-12 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H4744 (Similar To) 2024-06-20 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 118 of the Acts of 2024
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/S1219 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/S1219.pdf |