MA S124 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2534
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-13 - Accompanied a study order, see S2534
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-13 - Accompanied a study order, see S2534
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation relative to timely real estate document disclosure. Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure.
Title
Relative to real estate document disclosure
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-13 | Senate | Accompanied a study order, see S2534 |
2019-09-23 | Joint | Hearing rescheduled to 10/07/2019 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in Gardner Auditorium |
2019-09-19 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 09/30/2019 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in Gardner Auditorium |
2019-01-22 | House | House concurred |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure |
Same As/Similar To
H2876 (Similar To) 2020-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H4405
S773 (Similar To) 2020-04-06 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Rules
H342 (Similar To) 2020-02-26 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4452
H1524 (Similar To) 2020-11-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5081
S1666 (Similar To) 2020-05-18 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Rules
H2502 (Similar To) 2020-02-27 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling
S2052 (Similar To) 2020-04-27 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
H1769 (Similar To) 2020-01-13 - Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting for a second reading
H3691 (Similar To) 2020-06-24 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling
S2318 (Similar To) 2020-07-11 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
H4208 (Similar To) 2020-06-24 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling
S2534 (Replaced by) 2020-02-18 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
S773 (Similar To) 2020-04-06 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Rules
H342 (Similar To) 2020-02-26 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4452
H1524 (Similar To) 2020-11-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5081
S1666 (Similar To) 2020-05-18 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Rules
H2502 (Similar To) 2020-02-27 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling
S2052 (Similar To) 2020-04-27 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
H1769 (Similar To) 2020-01-13 - Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting for a second reading
H3691 (Similar To) 2020-06-24 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling
S2318 (Similar To) 2020-07-11 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
H4208 (Similar To) 2020-06-24 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling
S2534 (Replaced by) 2020-02-18 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S124 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S124.pdf |