MA S1268 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2842
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-07-01 - Accompanied a study order, see S2842
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-07-01 - Accompanied a study order, see S2842
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation relative to creating intensive stabilization and treatment units within the Department of Mental Health. Mental Health, Substance Use and Recovery.
Title
Relative to creating intensive stabilization and treatment units within the Department of Mental Health
Sponsors
Sen. Marc Pacheco [D] | Rep. Adam Scanlon [D] | Rep. Jack Lewis [D] | Sen. Paul Feeney [D] |
Sen. Michael Moore [D] | Sen. Salvatore DiDomenico [D] | Rep. Carol Doherty [D] | Sen. Pavel Payano [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-07-01 | Senate | Accompanied a study order, see S2842 |
2024-05-30 | Senate | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the Joint Committee on Health Care Financing |
2024-05-30 | Senate | Accompanied by H1989 |
2024-04-11 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2024-02-08 | House | Reporting date extended to Wednesday May 15, 2024, pending concurrence |
2023-09-24 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 10/02/2023 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-1 |
2023-02-16 | House | House concurred |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Mental Health, Substance Use and Recovery |
Same As/Similar To
H1989 (Similar To) 2024-05-30 - Accompanied S1268
S2842 (Replaced by) 2024-07-18 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
S2842 (Replaced by) 2024-07-18 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/S1268 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/S1268.pdf |