MA S13 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 17 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-02-17 - Referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 17 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-02-17 - Referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A report of the
Title
A report of the Senate Committee on Global Warming and Climate Change entitled: NO TIME TO WASTE: Our climate clock is ticking and our natural resources, public health and the future of our economy are at stake
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-02-17 | Senate | Referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means |
Same As/Similar To
S451 (Similar To) 2015-07-23 - New draft substituted as amended, see S1973
H752 (Similar To) 2015-06-18 - Accompanied S451
S1747 (Similar To) 2016-12-19 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
S1785 (Similar To) 2016-12-19 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
S1973 (Similar To) 2015-07-23 - Passed to be engrossed -see Roll Call #54 [YEAS 37 to NAYS 0]
S1979 (Similar To) 2016-04-11 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 75 of the Acts of 2016
S2058 (Similar To) 2015-11-18 - See S1979
S1870 (Similar To) 2016-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see S2387
S1498 (Similar To) 2016-05-12 - Accompanied a study order, see S2290
S2028 (Similar To) 2016-02-08 - Read; and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H4271 (Similar To) 2017-01-03 - Referred to the House Committee on Bills in the Third Reading
H752 (Similar To) 2015-06-18 - Accompanied S451
S1747 (Similar To) 2016-12-19 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
S1785 (Similar To) 2016-12-19 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
S1973 (Similar To) 2015-07-23 - Passed to be engrossed -see Roll Call #54 [YEAS 37 to NAYS 0]
S1979 (Similar To) 2016-04-11 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 75 of the Acts of 2016
S2058 (Similar To) 2015-11-18 - See S1979
S1870 (Similar To) 2016-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see S2387
S1498 (Similar To) 2016-05-12 - Accompanied a study order, see S2290
S2028 (Similar To) 2016-02-08 - Read; and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H4271 (Similar To) 2017-01-03 - Referred to the House Committee on Bills in the Third Reading
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/S13 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/S13.pdf |