MA S1304 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2292
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2292
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2292
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation relative to training for law enforcement. Public Safety and Homeland Security.
Title
Relative to training for law enforcement
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-07 | Senate | Accompanied a study order, see S2292 |
2017-12-04 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 12/19/2017 from 11:00 AM-03:00 PM in B-1 |
2017-11-20 | Joint | Hearing canceled – new hearing TBD |
2017-11-20 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 11/28/2017 from 02:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-1 |
2017-01-23 | House | House concurred |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Public Safety and Homeland Security |
Same As/Similar To
S1360 (Similar To) 2018-07-18 - Accompanied S1380
S1153 (Similar To) 2018-01-29 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1328 (Similar To) 2018-01-29 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1241 (Similar To) 2018-06-21 - New draft substituted, see S2567
S1223 (Similar To) 2018-05-31 - Accompanied a study order, see S2535
S1369 (Similar To) 2018-03-05 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1371 (Similar To) 2018-01-26 - Accompanied S1328
S974 (Similar To) 2018-03-01 - Accompanied a study order, see S2313
S1054 (Similar To) 2018-03-22 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H1168 (Similar To) 2017-05-30 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3719
H1255 (Similar To) 2018-05-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4528
H1319 (Similar To) 2018-07-17 - Accompanied a study order, see H4767
S2109 (Similar To) 2017-10-26 - New draft substituted, see S2192
S2257 (Similar To) 2018-01-25 - Referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S2292 (Replaced by) 2018-03-05 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
S2297 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H4321 (Similar To) 2018-04-30 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4438
S1153 (Similar To) 2018-01-29 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1328 (Similar To) 2018-01-29 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1241 (Similar To) 2018-06-21 - New draft substituted, see S2567
S1223 (Similar To) 2018-05-31 - Accompanied a study order, see S2535
S1369 (Similar To) 2018-03-05 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1371 (Similar To) 2018-01-26 - Accompanied S1328
S974 (Similar To) 2018-03-01 - Accompanied a study order, see S2313
S1054 (Similar To) 2018-03-22 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H1168 (Similar To) 2017-05-30 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3719
H1255 (Similar To) 2018-05-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4528
H1319 (Similar To) 2018-07-17 - Accompanied a study order, see H4767
S2109 (Similar To) 2017-10-26 - New draft substituted, see S2192
S2257 (Similar To) 2018-01-25 - Referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S2292 (Replaced by) 2018-03-05 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
S2297 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H4321 (Similar To) 2018-04-30 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4438
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/S1304 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/S1304.pdf |