MA S1334 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2314
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on April 15 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-06-06 - Accompanied a study order, see S2314
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 15 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-06-06 - Accompanied a study order, see S2314
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation relative to assessments made by the state board of retirement to certain regional school districts. Public Service.
Title
Relative to assessments made by the state board of retirement to certain regional school districts
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-06 | Senate | Accompanied a study order, see S2314 |
2015-11-03 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 11/10/2015 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in A-1 |
2015-04-15 | House | House concurred |
2015-04-15 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Public Service |
Same As/Similar To
S2314 (Replaced by) 2016-06-09 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
S289 (Similar To) 2015-07-23 - Accompanied a new draft, see S1975
S272 (Similar To) 2016-06-16 - Accompanied a study order, see S2341
S290 (Similar To) 2015-07-23 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Rules
S1975 (Similar To) 2015-07-23 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H1839 (Similar To) 2016-04-06 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
S289 (Similar To) 2015-07-23 - Accompanied a new draft, see S1975
S272 (Similar To) 2016-06-16 - Accompanied a study order, see S2341
S290 (Similar To) 2015-07-23 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Rules
S1975 (Similar To) 2015-07-23 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H1839 (Similar To) 2016-04-06 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/S1334 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/S1334.pdf |