MA S1351 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-01 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Rules
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-01 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Rules
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation relative to the department of public health state public health laboratory campus. Public Health.
Title
Relative to the department of public health state public health laboratory campus
Sponsors
Sen. Julian Cyr [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-01 | Senate | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Rules |
2023-09-08 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 09/20/2023 from 09:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-2 |
2023-07-21 | Joint | Hearing canceled – new hearing TBD |
2023-07-17 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 07/26/2023 from 09:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-2 |
2023-02-16 | House | House concurred |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Public Health |
Same As/Similar To
S1437 (Similar To) 2024-02-15 - Accompanied a study order, see S2648
H2170 (Similar To) 2024-07-01 - Accompanied a study order, see H4739
S2425 (Similar To) 2023-07-27 - Reprinted as amended, see S2429
S2681 (Similar To) 2024-05-16 - Committee recommended ought to pass and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S2739 (Similar To) 2024-05-23 - Accompanied a study order, see S2795
H2170 (Similar To) 2024-07-01 - Accompanied a study order, see H4739
S2425 (Similar To) 2023-07-27 - Reprinted as amended, see S2429
S2681 (Similar To) 2024-05-16 - Committee recommended ought to pass and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S2739 (Similar To) 2024-05-23 - Accompanied a study order, see S2795
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/S1351 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/S1351.pdf |