MA S1393 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2780
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-24 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2780
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-24 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2780
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to expand access to Naloxone. Public Health.
Title
To expand access to Naloxone
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-24 | Senate | Accompanied a new draft, see S2780 |
2022-02-22 | House | House concurred |
2022-02-17 | Senate | Reporting date extended to Saturday December 31, 2022, pending concurrence |
2021-05-21 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 06/07/2021 from 10:00 AM-02:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-03-29 | House | House concurred |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Public Health |
Same As/Similar To
S1302 (Similar To) 2022-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see S2919
S1431 (Similar To) 2022-02-14 - Accompanied a study order, see S2692
S1648 (Similar To) 2022-03-21 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S698 (Similar To) 2022-02-17 - Accompanied a study order, see S2700
S2107 (Similar To) 2022-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see S2681
H2361 (Similar To) 2022-03-24 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2780
S2780 (Replaced by) 2023-01-03 - New draft substituted, see S3182
S1431 (Similar To) 2022-02-14 - Accompanied a study order, see S2692
S1648 (Similar To) 2022-03-21 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S698 (Similar To) 2022-02-17 - Accompanied a study order, see S2700
S2107 (Similar To) 2022-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see S2681
H2361 (Similar To) 2022-03-24 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2780
S2780 (Replaced by) 2023-01-03 - New draft substituted, see S3182
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/S1393 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/S1393.pdf |