MA S14 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 9 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-10 - Joint session held and recessed to Thursday, November 14, 2024
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 9 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-10 - Joint session held and recessed to Thursday, November 14, 2024
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
By Mr. Tarr, a petition of Bruce E. Tarr for a legislative amendment to the Constitution to require a supermajority vote for the utilization of rainy day funds. Revenue.
Title
Proposal for a legislative amendment to the Constitution requiring a supermajority vote for the utilization of rainy day funds
Sponsors
Sen. Bruce Tarr [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-10 | Joint | Joint session held and recessed to Thursday, November 14, 2024 |
2023-10-11 | Senate | Joint session held and recessed to Wednesday, April 10, 2024 |
2023-05-10 | Joint | Joint session held and recessed to Wednesday, October 11, 2023 |
2023-05-08 | Senate | Called for consideration in the joint session |
2023-04-27 | House | Placed on file, in concurrence |
2023-04-27 | Senate | Proposal for Constitutional Amendment reported adversely by committee and placed on file |
2023-04-05 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 04/10/2023 from 11:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-2 |
2023-02-09 | House | House concurred |
2023-02-09 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Revenue |
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/S14 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/S14.pdf |