MA S140 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-09-20 - Hearing scheduled for 10/03/2017 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in A-1
Pending: Joint Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-09-20 - Hearing scheduled for 10/03/2017 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in A-1
Pending: Joint Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation relative to hearses. Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure.
Title
Relative to hearses
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-09-20 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 10/03/2017 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in A-1 |
2017-01-23 | House | House concurred |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure |
Same As/Similar To
S126 (Similar To) 2017-09-20 - Hearing scheduled for 10/03/2017 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in A-1
S916 (Similar To) 2017-10-02 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2170
S567 (Similar To) 2018-04-30 - Accompanied a study order, see S2496
S637 (Similar To) 2018-05-31 - Accompanied a study order, see S2535
S1916 (Similar To) 2017-10-05 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H1009 (Similar To) 2018-07-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H4729
H745 (Similar To) 2017-10-02 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2170
S916 (Similar To) 2017-10-02 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2170
S567 (Similar To) 2018-04-30 - Accompanied a study order, see S2496
S637 (Similar To) 2018-05-31 - Accompanied a study order, see S2535
S1916 (Similar To) 2017-10-05 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H1009 (Similar To) 2018-07-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H4729
H745 (Similar To) 2017-10-02 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2170
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/S140 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/S140.pdf |